INTERNATIONAL AID FOR THE PROTECTION AND WELFARE OF ANIMALS

Charity number: 1137532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £126.03k £132.75k £162.22k £250.34k £225.40k
Total expenditure £129.99k £136.53k £136.51k £236.74k £229.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £3.38k