THE AZAD CHOUDHURY EDUCATION AND WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1137053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £22.89k £9.13k £7.21k £12.75k £11.69k
Total expenditure £11.00k £30.08k £8.23k £12.71k £9.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A