Accounts and annual returns L H Pandzou Foundation

Charity number: 1138959
Charity reporting is overdue by 502 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 502 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 502 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required