Financial history L H Pandzou Foundation

Charity number: 1138959
Charity reporting is overdue by 500 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.52k £2.27k £2.20k £1.55k £1.56k
Total expenditure £7.42k £2.21k £2.19k £1.61k £1.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A