Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, SELLY OAK

Charity number: 1137205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Hazel Susan White Chair 01 September 2020
None on record
Sarah Jane Marshall Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
Professor Susan Hunston Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Kirsty Simms Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Prue Huddleston Trustee 15 May 2018
None on record
Margaret Charlwood Trustee 23 May 2017
None on record
SUZANNE JOHNSTON Trustee 23 May 2017
None on record
Dr GEORGE ROBERT HARRISON Trustee 23 May 2017
None on record
Rev David Parker Trustee 17 April 2016
None on record
Rev Jayne Adams Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
Martin Sorby Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
Mary Cutler Trustee 04 October 2013
None on record
Laura Hart Trustee 04 October 2013
None on record
Kate Cheyney Trustee 04 October 2013
None on record
Stephen Constable Trustee 04 October 2013
None on record
JOHN SURTEES Trustee
NORTHFIELD FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND SPEECH
Received: On time
BEN REEVES Trustee
None on record
GERALD FAGE Trustee
None on record
RICHARD EDMONDS Trustee
None on record