BURY HOSPICE

Charity number: 1136843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Hibbert Trustee 27 January 2020 None on record
Dr Gillian Rink Trustee 01 November 2016 None on record
Ruth Moyra Robinson Trustee 15 June 2016 None on record
Donna Maria McNicoll Trustee 11 November 2016 None on record
Ruth Deakin Trustee 15 March 2021 None on record
Stuart Page Trustee 28 May 2019 None on record
Paul Horrocks Trustee 19 February 2016 None on record
Tom Postlethwaite Trustee 15 March 2021 None on record
Deborah Lisle Trustee 28 May 2019 None on record
Christine Claydon- Butler Trustee 25 March 2019 None on record
NOREEN ANN KERSHAW D.A. MANC. Trustee 15 June 2016 None on record
Liaqat Ali Trustee 15 March 2021
THE BURY ISLAMIC CENTRE Received: On time
BURY FAITH FORUM Received: 68 days late
Devin Cassidy Trustee 15 March 2021 None on record