Financial history MUSIC BEYOND MAINSTREAM LTD

Charity number: 1141227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £96.08k £213.96k £61.32k £40.05k £161.93k
Total expenditure £171.52k £224.99k £78.27k £83.33k £66.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £16.51k £158.00k