BRASSINGTON RECREATION GROUND CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1138255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £64.14k £1.95k £1.91k £720 £1.42k
Total expenditure £66.72k £2.44k £909 £1.25k £2.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.04k N/A N/A N/A N/A