ANGLICAN CONSULTATIVE COUNCIL

Charity number: 1137273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.37m £2.39m £2.75m £2.76m £2.80m
Total expenditure £2.15m £2.66m £2.62m £2.71m £3.13m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.25m £2.19m £2.65m £2.67m £2.80m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £55.38k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £37.23k £32.28k £34.74k £50.51k £54.39k
Income - Other £81.40k £160.64k £15.04k £34.84k £24.55k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.07m £2.66m £2.62m £2.71m £3.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £83.69k £149.28k £37.23k £15.40k £19.63k
Expenditure - Grants institution £7.50k £9.50k £284.07k £364.71k £193.47k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other -£98.07k £0 £0 £0 £0