ANGLICAN CONSULTATIVE COUNCIL

Charity number: 1137273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Most Revd and Rt Hon JUSTIN PORTAL WELBY Trustee 29 April 2013
THE ARCHBISHOP OF CANTERBURY'S CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
CANTERBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
LAMBETH PALACE LIBRARY TRUST FUND Received: On time
BROMLEY AND SHEPPARD'S COLLEGES CHARITY Received: On time
The Very Revd Hosam Naoum Trustee 04 May 2019 None on record
The Most Revd Humphrey Peters Trustee 04 March 2020 None on record
The Most Revd Paul Kwong Chair 06 June 2011
THE ARCHBISHOP OF CANTERBURY'S ANGLICAN COMMUNION FUND Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF THE ARCHBISHOP OF CANTERBURY'S ANGLICAN COMMUNION FUND Received: On time
THE ANGLICAN CENTRE IN ROME Received: On time
MARGARET ANNE SWINSON Trustee 18 April 2016
CHRISTIAN AID Received: On time
LIVERPOOL HOPE UNIVERSITY Received: On time
THE ARCHBISHOP OF CANTERBURY'S ANGLICAN COMMUNION FUND Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MATTHEW AND ST. JAMES MOSSLEY HILL, LIVERPOOL Received: On time
FRANCIS NEILSON TRUST FUND Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF THE ARCHBISHOP OF CANTERBURY'S ANGLICAN COMMUNION FUND Received: On time
CHRISTIAN AID Received: On time
The Right Revd Joel Waweru Mwangi Trustee 18 April 2016 None on record
Rt Revd Jane Alexander Trustee 18 April 2016 None on record
Basetsana Makena Trustee 04 May 2019 None on record
The Most Revd John David Edward Davies Trustee 03 March 2020
BRECON CATHEDRAL CHOIR TRUST Received: On time
SWANSEA AND BRECON DIOCESAN TRUST (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
SWANSEA AND BRECON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: 10 days late
THE LLANGASTY RETREAT HOUSE TRUST
THE REPRESENTATIVE BODY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES Received: On time
BRIDGET BEVAN'S FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE ARCHDEACONRIES CLERICAL CHARITY Received: On time
POWIS EXHIBITION FUND Received: On time
OLD NATIONAL SCHOOL Received: On time
The Most Revd Dr Jackson Nasoore Ole Sapit Trustee 01 May 2020 None on record
The Most Revd Philip Richardson Trustee 13 February 2020 None on record
Jeroham Melendez Trustee 18 April 2016 None on record
The Most Revd Julio Emesto Murray Thompson Trustee 28 November 2018 None on record
Alistair Dinnie Trustee 18 April 2016 None on record
Joyce Haji Liundi Trustee 04 May 2019 None on record