THE HANTS-SURREY BORDER METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1137593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £552.57k £469.78k £443.60k £448.99k £441.99k
Total expenditure £427.06k £442.82k £439.16k £427.46k £380.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £338.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £41.91k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £6.22k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £166.15k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £403.34k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £22.92k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £17.71k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £800 N/A N/A N/A N/A