Financial history FIGHT FOR PEACE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1137636
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £1.80m £6.15m £4.00m £2.12m £2.38m
Total expenditure £2.32m £3.05m £3.61m £3.07m £2.21m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £68.80k £215.30k £488.41k £367.83k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.05m £5.16m £2.84m £2.00m £0
Income - Other trading activities £747.13k £985.34k £1.16m £117.87k £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £603 £1.23k £753 £31 £20.93k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.26m £3.02m £3.54m £3.07m £2.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £57.27k £34.69k £63.57k £5.09k £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.50k £0 £0 £0 £18.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £505.68k £0 £0 £0 £331.06k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0