Accounts and annual returns FIGHT FOR PEACE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1137636
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 January 2024 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 January 2024 87 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window