Financial history THE UNIV. OLD MEMBERS' TRUST

Charity number: 1137545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £242.79k £236.47k £234.96k £198.01k £111.31k
Total expenditure £362.64k £375.11k £361.27k £346.94k £304.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A