Accounts and annual returns THE CHRISTIAN BLANDFORD FUND

Charity number: 1139614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2022 15 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2019 03 February 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 15 February 2020 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 04 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window