CHESTER-LE-STREET METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1137919
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £233.47k £262.35k £254.28k £266.99k £260.67k
Total expenditure £252.88k £252.34k £245.62k £258.83k £263.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.11k £2.36k £1.24k £3.50k £11.76k