CHESTER-LE-STREET METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1137919
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

28 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Christopher Garlick Trustee 11 October 2021 None on record
TREVOR BLACKLOCK Trustee None on record
DOROTHY MARY CARR Trustee 14 May 2018 None on record
THOMAS ALAN SMITH B.ED Trustee
CHESTER LE STREET METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: 104 days late
Robert Berry Trustee 09 May 2016
CESTRIA U3A AT CHESTER-LE-STREET Received: On time
FREDERICK HERBERT LOUIS JOHNSON Trustee 15 May 2013 None on record
MARION SMITH Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
CLAIRE MORDUE Trustee None on record
Jean Auld Trustee
CHESTER LE STREET METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: 104 days late
BRENDA WOOD B.ED HONS Trustee None on record
Dorothy Jean Hedley Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
Brian Straughan FCA Trustee
FRIENDS OF THE ORIENTAL MUSEUM Received: On time
CHESTER LE STREET METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: 104 days late
ROTARY CLUB OF CHESTER-LE-STREET TRUST FUND Received: On time
ERIC DIXON DONKIN Trustee
CHESTER LE STREET METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: 104 days late
MARGARET LESLEY WALTON Trustee None on record
Liz Kent Trustee 01 September 2015
CHESTER LE STREET METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: 104 days late
Karen Angela Heptinstalll Trustee 27 January 2013 None on record
Joan Moore Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record
Deacon Linda Watkin Trustee 01 September 2013
BIRTLEY METHODIST CHURCH PARENT AND TODDLER PLAYGROUP Received: On time
CHESTER LE STREET METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: 104 days late
THOMAS WILLIAM INDIAN Trustee None on record
REV IAN KENT Trustee 01 September 2014
CREATIVE COMMUNICATIONS TRUST Received: On time
ALAN HEDLEY Trustee
JOHN EDEN'S ALMSHOUSES Received: On time
CHESTER-LE-STREET YOUTH CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE Overdue by 1494 days
MIRIAM PROCTOR Trustee
CHESTER LE STREET METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: 104 days late
DOREEN HUME Trustee None on record
ROBERT GARDINER DOBSON Trustee None on record
Stephen Wroe Trustee 09 May 2016
THE JAMES ETHERINGTON AWARD Received: On time
Derick Joseph Lawson Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
Freda Raine Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
Kathryn Margaret Johnson Trustee 07 May 2014 None on record