STEVENAGE FOOTBALL CLUB FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1140006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER GOCHIN Trustee 09 December 2013
Garden House Hospice Care Received: On time
MARK HUBBOCKS Trustee 25 May 2011
ASSOCIATION FOR RESPIRATORY TECHNOLOGY AND PHYSIOLOGY Received: On time
AIDEN SANDERSON Trustee 16 January 2013 None on record
STEPHEN THOMAS EDWARD MCQUEEN Trustee 25 October 2012 None on record
PHIL WALLACE Chair None on record
Carol Ashby Trustee 07 June 2016 None on record
Richard James Joyce Trustee 09 October 2018 None on record