THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN CORRINGHAM

Charity number: 1138056
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER CRAGGS Trustee 12 March 1994 None on record
PETER HANDSCOMBE Trustee None on record
MANDY WAITE Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
DAVID RICHARD MOTT Trustee 12 March 1992
THE SOCIETY OF OUR LADY OF PEW IN WESTMINSTER ABBEY Received: On time
THE REVEREND DAVID ROLLINS Trustee 12 March 2005
THE VINEYARDS TRUST Received: On time
VICTORIA JONES Trustee 01 April 2013 None on record
CAROL WEBB Trustee 12 March 2007 None on record
WENDY MOTT Trustee 12 March 1983 None on record
BEVERLEY HOWELLS Trustee None on record
Rev John Noddings Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record