Financial history YEMENI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LONDON

Charity number: 1139725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/06/2017 11/06/2018 11/06/2019 11/06/2020 11/06/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £500 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £400 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A