Financial history ALFAJR TRUST

Charity number: 1139375
Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £33.76k £16.50k £13.70k £3.65k £14.07k
Total expenditure £23.98k £19.85k £14.00k £10.33k £14.26k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A