P1 MARINE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 November 2021 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 September 2020 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 January 2020 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 July 2018 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 July 2018 10 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 01 August 2017 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 01 August 2017 32 days late Download