P1 MARINE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £46.65k £42.03k £4.04k £934 £272
Total expenditure £46.23k £44.80k £5.59k £175 £585
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A