BREAST CANCER UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1138866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £289.64k £319.90k £433.39k £395.92k £401.90k
Total expenditure £268.05k £294.50k £458.23k £381.95k £474.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A