BRISTOL CONCERT WIND BAND

Charity number: 1142960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £21.63k £21.94k £24.16k £19.87k £22.91k
Total expenditure £18.17k £20.78k £22.51k £24.96k £23.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A