Financial history ADVANCE MYANMAR LTD

Charity number: 1139662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.59k £56.95k £60.55k £159.00k £443.49k
Total expenditure £156 £2.86k £56.90k £130.05k £348.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A