Financial history CHANGING LIVES TOGETHER

Charity number: 1139983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.01m £1.11m £1.33m £2.33m £2.36m
Total expenditure £990.90k £1.14m £1.29m £2.19m £2.22m
Income from government contracts £542.31k £646.52k £718.15k £1.28m £1.44m
Income from government grants £50.45k £4.63k £10.85k N/A £33.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.18k £10.20k £25.62k £4.09k £5.56k
Income - Other trading activities £920.49k £1.02m £1.22m £526.53k £279.41k
Income - Charitable activities £83.01k £78.67k £80.38k £1.70m £1.81m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £7.03k £3.07k
Income - Other £0 £1.25k £0 £88.61k £258.82k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £608.78k £736.10k £703.81k £1.96m £2.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £382.12k £407.27k £590.69k £225.92k £150.27k
Expenditure - Governance £13.39k £16.88k £18.79k £12.40k £10.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0