THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKES (LAMBETH)

Charity number: 1138272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 December 2019 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 December 2019 59 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 May 2017 On time Download