Accounts and annual returns HEDGEHOG HAVEN RESCUE CENTRE

Charity number: 1138493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required