CROYDON ISLAMIC ACADEMY

Charity number: 1141001
Charity reporting is up to date (93 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £138.25k £212.04k £64.38k £43.79k £94.10k
Total expenditure £11.22k £9.65k £25.77k £27.73k £21.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A