Financial history THE CAGYS TRUST

Charity number: 1139237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £13.33k £5.65k £7.17k £12.32k £18.98k
Total expenditure £13.82k £3.11k £3.06k £8.17k £16.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A