Financial history ENFIELD CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1140089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £671.46k £878.83k £872.93k £1.14m £1.22m
Total expenditure £569.73k £692.16k £624.82k £881.46k £1.19m
Income from government contracts £0 £358.99k £341.54k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £654.62k £136.50k £110.00k £37.54k £635.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £12.29k £216.85k £1.60k £201.61k £73.49k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £1.73k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £654.62k £659.67k £659.94k £898.52k £782.73k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £423 £580 £1.40k £560 £406
Income - Other £4.13k £0 £210.00k £37.54k £365.28k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £569.73k £681.84k £616.23k £868.61k £1.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £10.33k £8.59k £12.85k £13.69k
Expenditure - Governance £8.71k £8.00k £7.27k £11.64k £18.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0