Financial history GOD IS ABLE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1139268
Charity reporting is up to date (116 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k £46.27k £52.82k
Total expenditure £9.99k £9.92k £9.92k £46.44k £46.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A