WHISPER

Charity number: 1139078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £168.89k £228.08k £322.02k £349.59k £227.29k
Total expenditure £193.36k £219.79k £326.78k £353.17k £215.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A