FREEDOM CHARITY

Charity number: 1139657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £48.47k £34.03k £3.15k £4.05k £5.36k
Total expenditure £59.96k £10.88k £21.83k £37.61k £10.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £36.50k £26.65k N/A N/A N/A