FREEDOM CHARITY

Charity number: 1139657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DIANA LARGE Trustee 17 July 2011 None on record
Daniel Kingsley Smith JP Chair 10 January 2021 None on record
ANEETA PREM Trustee None on record
Ciaran Peter O'Shea Trustee 10 January 2021 None on record
Dr Mary Geraldine Hutchinson B.Ed Hons Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
Selda Kurtuldu Trustee 04 January 2021 None on record
Shameen Katharina Mimi Highfield JP Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Theresa Ann Cherry Trustee 10 January 2021 None on record
Helena Deirdre Spencer - Silver Trustee 22 October 2020 None on record