WICKSTEED CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1142103
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £4.94m £5.34m £6.11m £5.40m £5.24m
Total expenditure £4.66m £4.78m £5.52m £6.36m £5.70m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £65.12k £22.84k £104.80k £101.74k £13.11k
Income - Other trading activities £4.49m £4.89m £14.98k £16.26k £8.74k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £5.58m £5.16m £5.21m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £127.27k £134.81k £166.67k £87.05k £583
Income - Other £265.77k £287.10k £34.98k £36.17k £7.02k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £13.11k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.57m £4.74m £5.46m £6.35m £5.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £75.04k £42.17k £55.19k £16.17k £190
Expenditure - Governance £23.22k £44.72k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £12.81k £13.53k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £12.14k £0 £0 £0 £0