WICKSTEED CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1142103
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas Peter Vaughan Trustee 10 October 2017 None on record
LINDEN GROVES Trustee 19 February 2013 None on record
John Richard Pegg Trustee 09 January 2015 None on record
Paul Adam Stamper Trustee 12 November 2018 None on record
OLIVER CHARLES WICKSTEED Chair 25 May 2011 None on record
CHRISTOPHER JOHN PYKETT Trustee 22 June 2011 None on record
ROBERT HUNT Trustee 25 May 2011 None on record