SOUTHAMPTON CHINESE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1141228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 January 2020 75 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time Download