ST MARY'S MILL BANK PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1141418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.65k £12.30k £6.05k £3.16k £2.90k
Total expenditure £4.45k £5.21k £2.32k £1.96k £6.79k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A