INSTITUTE OF WELFARE

Charity number: 1144623
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.37k £19.00k £19.72k £8.74k £15.97k
Total expenditure £11.14k £9.47k £20.72k £11.68k £8.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A