PEDESTRIAN LIMITED

Charity number: 1140032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £202.56k £298.66k £265.63k £281.57k £272.56k
Total expenditure £258.44k £292.06k £246.14k £280.66k £248.68k
Income from government contracts £44.06k £24.55k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A