Trustees TIPTREE YOUTH PROJECT OUTREACH

Charity number: 1141995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVEREND ANNE-MARIE LOUISE RENSHAW Chair 05 October 2011
ANTHONY ABDY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TOLLESHUNT KNIGHTS WITH TIPTREE
Received: On time
PATRICIA JOYCE SOUTHWOOD Trustee 18 January 2022
None on record
RYAN TRENCHARD Trustee 16 November 2021
None on record
JONATHAN MARK GREENWOOD Trustee 21 July 2015
THE BARN CHURCH FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
Rev Ken Thom Trustee 21 July 2015
None on record
JULIAN WYNCOLL Trustee 16 November 2012
None on record
FATHER GORDON READ Trustee 19 May 2011
None on record