Financial history FULHAM PALACE TRUST

Charity number: 1140088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.87m £2.11m £2.32m £2.26m £1.93m
Total expenditure £1.33m £1.33m £1.66m £1.65m £1.64m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £114.75k £117.03k £395.58k
Income - Donations and legacies £902.17k £1.17m £1.36m £1.02m £814.53k
Income - Other trading activities £343.99k £333.18k £287.66k £346.35k £212.62k
Income - Charitable activities £625.91k £608.89k £678.54k £890.57k £905.34k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.15k £700 £724 £648 £402
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.21m £1.13m £1.58m £1.55m £1.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds £79.70k £72.41k £63.00k £66.15k £56.76k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £18.63k £12.98k £9.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £35.59k £130.05k £19.56k £27.60k £10.35k