Trustees ART AGAINST KNIVES

Charity number: 1140866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Pole Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
Bavinder Kaur McPartland Trustee 29 August 2020
None on record
Dr Luke Solon Trustee 15 November 2017
None on record
Robina Lamche-Brennan Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record
ALICE MILLEST Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record
Jack Stephen Joslin Trustee 11 May 2016
None on record
Elizabeth Nottingham Trustee 10 September 2014
None on record