OUSEBURN FARM CHARITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1142593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £342.71k £430.63k £495.45k £563.37k £430.35k
Total expenditure £360.68k £423.72k £507.36k £551.10k £358.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £36.21k £29.74k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £100.00k £42.44k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £327.37k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £120.26k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £115.75k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £17.75k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £526.49k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £24.61k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A