OUSEBURN FARM CHARITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1142593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Penhall Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record
Carol Singleton Trustee 30 January 2020 None on record
Lauren Patterson Trustee 07 November 2019
NIWE EATING DISTRESS SERVICE TRADING AS EATING DISTRESS NORTH EAST
Jennifer Hartley Trustee 07 November 2019 None on record
Jo Thornton Trustee 06 April 2017 None on record
David Chadwick Male Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record
MARIE GRAHAM Trustee 27 June 2011 None on record
Michael Peter Ross Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record
Richard Turner Trustee 07 November 2019 None on record
Ian Brown Chair 07 November 2019 None on record
Adrian James Philpotts Trustee 21 March 2017 None on record
Nicola Jane Bramley Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record
Catherine Anne Kirkham Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record