AFRICAN VILLAGE SCHOOL FUND (AVSF)

Charity number: 1140971
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 January 2020 03 December 2020 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 January 2019 29 February 2020 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 January 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 January 2017 18 December 2017 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 04 January 2016 04 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2016 Not Required