ANJUMA RAZA-E-MUSTAFA TRUST

Charity number: 1140777
Charity reporting is overdue by 999 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £39.55k £39.00k £42.46k £40.30k £36.96k
Total expenditure £27.38k £34.95k £37.39k £41.55k £26.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A