Financial history MOJA PAMOJA

Charity number: 1140701
Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/07/2018 30/07/2019 30/07/2020 30/07/2021 30/07/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £500 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A